WV SB779 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to impose deadlines for the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner to perform an autopsy and to provide a copy of the autopsy report.
Title
Imposing deadlines for autopsies and autopsy reports
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 200) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 200) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB5614 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 12 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |