WV SB74 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting nonpaid volunteers at ski areas from workers' compensation benefits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting nonpaid volunteers at ski areas from workers' compensation benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 135) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseTo House Banking and Insurance
2019-02-15HouseTo Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
2019-02-15HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-14SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 135)
2019-02-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-14SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-13SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-13SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-12SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-12SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-11SenateReported do pass
2019-02-05SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2019-01-09SenateTo Banking and Insurance
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2321aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback