WV SB735 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-08 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-08 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to dedicate 5% of every million dollars of certain severance taxes for the use and benefit of the counties and municipalities from which those taxes were generated.
Title
Dedicating parts of certain severance taxes to counties and municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-04 | With amendment, do pass | |
2008-02-28 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-28 | To Finance | |
2008-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-27 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 64) | |
2008-02-27 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 64) | |
2008-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-27 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 63) | |
2008-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-27 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-27 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-27 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-27 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2008-02-18 | To Finance | |
2008-02-18 | To Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-18 | To Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=735&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |