WV SB730 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 259, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 259, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand the authority of the Legislative Oversight Commission on Health and Human Resources Accountability Commission, to give authority for routine, and as needed reports and to describe how these reports are to be submitted.
Title
Expanding authority of Legislative Oversight Commission on Health and Human Resources Accountability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 550) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 549) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 396) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 396) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 455) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 454) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 268) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 268) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 549) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 396) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 396) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 455) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 454) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 268) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 268) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 259, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/13/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 550) |
2023-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 549) |
2023-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2023-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 396) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 396) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-03 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 455) |
2023-03-03 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 454) |
2023-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-24 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-24 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 268) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 268) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 29E | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 29E | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 29E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 29E | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |