WV SB72 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-08 - Senate adopted conference report and rejected bill (Roll No. 84)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-08 - Senate adopted conference report and rejected bill (Roll No. 84)
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand the counties covered by West Virginia Route 2 and Interstate 68 Authority to include Cabell, Mason and Jackson counties.
Title
Expanding Route 2 and Interstate 68 Authority territory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | Senate adopted conference report and rejected bill (Roll No. 84) | |
2008-03-08 | Conference report filed - Senate | |
2008-03-08 | Conference report filed - House | |
2008-03-08 | To conference | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Senate appoints conference committee: Jenkins, Plymale, Yoder | |
2008-03-08 | Senate agreed to conference | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House appointed conferees: Martin, Hutchins, Sobonya | |
2008-03-08 | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-08 | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-07 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Passed House (Roll No. 383) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 382) | |
2008-03-07 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading, Local Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-05 | With amendment, do pass | |
2008-03-03 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-03-03 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-01-30 | To House Government Organization | |
2008-01-30 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-30 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-29 | Ordered to House | |
2008-01-29 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2008-01-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-01-29 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-01-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-01-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-01-25 | Read 1st time | |
2008-01-25 | On 1st reading | |
2008-01-24 | Reported do pass | |
2008-01-09 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-09 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-09 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-09 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-09 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=72&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |