WV SB714 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - Placed at foot of bills
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - Placed at foot of bills
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to unify the custody and supervision of persons participating in an alternative sentencing program under the county sheriff.
Title
Relating to alternative sentencing programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-11 | Placed at foot of bills | |
2009-04-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-04-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-04-08 | With amendment, do pass | |
2009-04-01 | To House Judiciary | |
2009-04-01 | To Judiciary | |
2009-04-01 | Introduced in House | |
2009-04-01 | Ordered to House | |
2009-04-01 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 40) | |
2009-04-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-31 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-30 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-30 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-27 | Committee substitute reported | |
2009-03-23 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-23 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-23 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-03-23 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-23 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 11A | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=714&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |