WV SB702 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to involuntary hospitalization, competency, and criminal responsibility of persons charged or convicted of certain crimes
Title
Relating to involuntary hospitalization, competency, and criminal responsibility of persons charged or convicted of certain crimes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 479) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 629) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 276) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 629) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 276) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/20/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/21 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 479) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 629) |
2021-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-10 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2021-04-10 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-04-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 276) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 6A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 6A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 6A | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
27 | 6A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 6A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 6A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 6A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 6A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 6A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 6A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |