WV SB696 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor 3/31/08 - Senate Journal
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor 3/31/08 - Senate Journal
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the method of appraising certain affordable multifamily rental property for property tax assessment purposes.
Title
Providing appraisal methods for certain multifamily rental properties
Sponsors
Sen. John Yoder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 3/31/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-31 | Vetoed by Governor 3/31/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 3/31/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/08 | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-07 | Passed House (Roll No. 436) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-06 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-05 | Do pass | |
2008-02-28 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-28 | To Finance | |
2008-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-27 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 31) | |
2008-02-27 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) | |
2008-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-25 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-21 | On second reading to Finance | |
2008-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-21 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-21 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-21 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-21 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-18 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-18 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-18 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=696&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |