WV SB695 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 72, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 72, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing procedures for decreasing or increasing corporate limits by annexation
Title
Providing procedures for decreasing or increasing corporate limits by annexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 400) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 400) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 526) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 525) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 275) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 275) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 400) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 526) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 525) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 275) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 275) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 72, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-16 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 400) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 400) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 526) |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 525) |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-04-01 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-04-01 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 275) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 275) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 6 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 6 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |