WV SB687 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill relates to the Legislative Auditor; establishing that auditor is responsible to Joint Committee on Government and Finance; clarifying that auditor may exercise powers at direction of Senate President or Speaker of House of Delegates; restating authority of auditor to inspect properties, equipment, and records; providing for distribution of copies of reports of examination and audit; prohibiting auditor from using external auditing entities to conduct audits except as directed by Senate President or Speaker; modifying obligations of auditor regarding budgetary matters; providing that committee has authority to hire employees to assist auditor in performance of obligations; clarifying hiring authority of committee; providing that auditor's reviews of departments and agencies are to be conducted at direction of Senate President or Speaker and that department presentations are to be made at Senate President's or Speaker's direction; eliminating requirement that agency and regulatory board reviews be conducted according to certain auditing standards; revising schedule of regulatory board reviews; and providing that regulatory board reviews may be conducted more frequently than statutorily scheduled.
Title
Clarifying Legislative Auditor's scope of authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 425) (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and rejected bill (Roll No. 424) (Y: 15 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 573) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 572) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 571) (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 570) (Y: 15 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 569) (Y: 47 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 165) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 164) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and rejected bill (Roll No. 424) (Y: 15 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 573) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 572) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 571) (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 570) (Y: 15 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 569) (Y: 47 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 165) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 164) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/12/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Effective ninety days from passage |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 425) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and rejected bill (Roll No. 424) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Effective date rejected (Roll No. 573) |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 572) |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 571) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 570) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 569) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | To House Government Organization |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 165) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 164) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/16/2024 with right to amend |
2024-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-07 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-07 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB5592 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 10 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 10 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
4 | 10 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 2 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
4 | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 2 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 3 | 3c | Amended Code | Citation Text |