WV SB681 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation from Lottery Net Profits to Educational Broadcasting Authority
Title
Supplemental appropriation from Lottery Net Profits to Educational Broadcasting Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 692) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 691) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 413) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 413) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 412) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Constitutional rule suspension rejected (Roll No. 386) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 691) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 413) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 413) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 412) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Constitutional rule suspension rejected (Roll No. 386) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/13/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 692) |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 691) |
2019-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 413) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 413) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 412) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Constitutional rule suspension rejected (Roll No. 386) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |