WV SB678 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 14, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 14, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making supplementary appropriations from State Fund, General Revenue, to various accounts
Title
Making supplementary appropriations from State Fund, General Revenue, to various accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Truman Chafin [D] | Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] |
Sen. Mike Green [D] | Sen. Mike Hall [R] | Sen. Walt Helmick [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] |
Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] |
Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 54) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 416) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 414) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 413) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 54) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 416) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 414) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 413) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 14, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/21/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-21 | Approved by Governor 3/21/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/21/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor 3/21/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 54) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 416) | |
2012-03-10 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-10 | House reconsidered effective date | |
2012-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 414) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 413) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-08 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-03-07 | To House Finance | |
2012-03-07 | To Finance | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in House | |
2012-03-07 | Ordered to House | |
2012-03-07 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) | |
2012-03-07 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-05 | Reported do pass | |
2012-03-05 | Originating in Senate Finance |