WV SB676 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to limit the liability of the section of Parks and Recreation of the Division of Natural Resources, county parks and recreation commissions, boards of park and recreation commissioners and owners of land used for public parks and recreation purposes under an agreement with any of the foregoing entities.
Title
Limiting certain park and recreation owners' liabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-29 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-29 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-02-28 | To House Government Organization | |
2008-02-28 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2008-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-27 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 28) | |
2008-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-25 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-25 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-25 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2008-02-20 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-20 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-02-15 | To Government Organization | |
2008-02-15 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2008-02-15 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-15 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2008-02-15 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4403 (Similar To) 2010-02-24 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=676&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |