WV SB657 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 51, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 51, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing consumer protection regarding self-propelled farm equipment
Title
Providing consumer protection regarding self-propelled farm equipment
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 545) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 281) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 281) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 51, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 545) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 281) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 37 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 37 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |