WV SB650 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Protecting consumers from price gouging after state of emergency
Title
Protecting consumers from price gouging after state of emergency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 6J | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 6J | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |