WV SB65 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-27 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-27 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the school uniforms incentive plan pilot program to provide funding for certain public elementary schools which adopt and implement school uniform policies.
Title
Establishing school uniforms incentive plan pilot program
Sponsors
Sen. Truman Chafin [D] | Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. John Fanning [D] | Sen. Joseph Minard [D] |
Sen. Michael Oliverio [D] | Del. Danny Wells [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-27 | To House Education | |
2008-02-27 | To Education then Finance | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-26 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-26 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 2) | |
2008-02-26 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-25 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-22 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-22 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-22 | Committee substitute reported | |
2008-01-23 | To Finance | |
2008-01-23 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-09 | To Education | |
2008-01-09 | To Education then Finance | |
2008-01-09 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-09 | To Education then Finance | |
2008-01-09 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=65&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |