WV SB638 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 252, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 252, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changing hearing and notice provisions for failing or distressed public utilities
Title
Changing hearing and notice provisions for failing or distressed public utilities
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 341) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 374) (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 238) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 374) (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 238) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 252, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/9/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 341) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 374) |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/3/22 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-01 | House | Reference dispensed |
2022-03-01 | House | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 238) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2H | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |