WV SB630 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to define protections for election officials and election workers, including poll workers while performing the duties of the election process; and clarifies the conditions and circumstances of protections.
Title
Defining protections for election officials and election workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 191) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 191) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 9 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |