WV SB630 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Chief Technology Officer's duties with regard to security of government information
Title
Relating to Chief Technology Officer's duties with regard to security of government information
Sponsors
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 401) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 401) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) |
2013-04-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 401) |
2013-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2013-04-13 | House | Deferred |
2013-04-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Do pass |
2013-04-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | House | To House Government Organization |
2013-04-03 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 20) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3090 (Same As) 2013-03-25 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 6 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |