WV SB626 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supplementing, amending, and increasing existing items of appropriation from State Road Fund to DOT, DMV
Title
Supplementing, amending, and increasing existing items of appropriation from State Road Fund to DOT, DMV
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 391) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 390) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 192) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 192) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 390) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 192) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 192) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/12/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 391) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 390) |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-23 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-23 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 192) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 192) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4719 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - To House Finance