WV SB622 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing compensation for elected county officials
Title
Increasing compensation for elected county officials
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. William Ihlenfeld [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 269) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 269) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 269) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-04-01 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 269) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 269) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |