WV SB622 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to regulation and control of financing elections
Title
Relating generally to regulation and control of financing elections
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 727) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 484) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Title amendment rejected (Roll No. 646) (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 645) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 644) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 643) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 642) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 641) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 640) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Motion to reform amendment rejected (Roll No. 639) (Y: 48 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 638) (Y: 42 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 250) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 484) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Title amendment rejected (Roll No. 646) (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 645) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 644) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 643) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 642) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 641) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 640) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Motion to reform amendment rejected (Roll No. 639) (Y: 48 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 638) (Y: 42 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 250) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 727) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 484) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment rejected (Roll No. 646) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 645) |
2019-03-08 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 644) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 643) |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 642) |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 641) |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 640) |
2019-03-08 | House | Motion to reform amendment rejected (Roll No. 639) |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 638) |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-08 | House | Deferred |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 250) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 8 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 1b | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 8 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 2d | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 5b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 5c | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 8 | 5e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 5g | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 8 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 9a | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 8 | 9b | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 8 | 9c | New Code | See Bill Text |