WV SB620 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to traffic regulations
Title
Relating to traffic regulations
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 146) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-03-20 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 146) |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Originating in Senate Transportation and Infrastructure |
Same As/Similar To
HB2349 (Similar To) 2017-02-13 - To House Roads and Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 8 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |