WV SB619 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to annual business fees and reports due Secretary of State
Title
Relating to annual business fees and reports due Secretary of State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 44) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 44) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 402) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 401) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 44) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 402) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 401) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 44) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 44) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 402) | |
2012-03-10 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 401) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-09 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-02-29 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-29 | To Finance | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-29 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-29 | Effective July 1, 2012 (Roll No. 20) | |
2012-02-29 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-29 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-27 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-27 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-27 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-23 | To Finance | |
2012-02-23 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2012-02-16 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-16 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2012-02-16 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4595 (Same As) 2012-02-24 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |