WV SB617 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Commissioner of the Bureau for Medical Services to produce a report to determine the recommended levels of reimbursement for home and community-based providers that service Intellectual/Developmental Disability (I/DD) patients.
Title
Relating to Intellectual and Development Disabilities Waiver Program Workforce Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 788) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 621) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 691) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 621) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 691) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-11 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 788) |
2023-03-11 | House | Conference report received-House |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 621) |
2023-03-11 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To conference |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Maroney, Barrett, Woelfel |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-11 | House | House appointed conferees: Summers, Williams, Hardy |
2023-03-11 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 691) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-24 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-24 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5W | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5W | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 8 | 2b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
27 | 8 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |