WV SB615 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing ongoing mechanism for county commissioners to allow compensation increases for elected officials every two years
Title
Providing ongoing mechanism for county commissioners to allow compensation increases for elected officials every two years
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | To House Finance |
2019-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-27 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2995 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Political Subdivisions
HB3088 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Political Subdivisions
HB3088 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Political Subdivisions
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |