WV SB604 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 75, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 75, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill to include additional types of nonbroadcast media in the definition of “Electioneering Communication.” These changes reflect the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit’s decision in Center for Individual Freedom, et al v. Natalie H. Tennant, Secretary of State of West Virginia, et al.
Title
Expanding definition of "electioneering communication"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 352) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 75, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 352) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Do pass |
2013-04-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 8 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |