WV SB6 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 341, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 341, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing weight limits for vehicles on certain state highways
Title
Allowing DOH issue permits for certain tractors with certain trailers not exceeding specified maximum axle weights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 437) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 435) (Y: 19 N: 75 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - House - Motion bill be rejected not adopted (Roll No. 419) (Y: 41 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - House - Motion Previous Question rejected (Roll No. 418) (Y: 28 N: 70 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 178) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 435) (Y: 19 N: 75 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - House - Motion bill be rejected not adopted (Roll No. 419) (Y: 41 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - House - Motion Previous Question rejected (Roll No. 418) (Y: 28 N: 70 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 178) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 341, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 437) |
2020-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 435) |
2020-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-28 | House | Motion bill be rejected not adopted (Roll No. 419) |
2020-02-28 | House | Motion Previous Question rejected (Roll No. 418) |
2020-02-28 | House | Motion bill be Rejected on 1st reading |
2020-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 178) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Beach Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Smith Amendment not germane |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Smith Floor amendment reported |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 17 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |