WV SB595 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend the embalmer licensing requirements to permit a certain number of years of active military duty to substitute for college credit hours to qualify for licensure.
Title
Amending embalmer licensing requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 111) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 111) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization |
2024-01-30 | Senate | To Military |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-30 | Senate | To Military then Government Organization |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |