NH SB373 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0154; Effective 07/03/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0154; Effective 07/03/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state building code.
Title
Relative to the state building code.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Diane Pauer [R] |
Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0154; Effective 07/03/2024 |
2024-06-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 51 |
2024-05-23 | House | Amendment # 2024-1855h: Amendment Failed DV 150-215 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 51 |
2024-05-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1855h (NT) 05/08/2024 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 16 |
2024-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-15 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-12 | House | Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 103 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1364s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1364s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1364s, 04/11/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 14A |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Special Order to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Remove SB 373 from the Consent Calendar; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1364s, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |