WV SB590 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting guided bear hunts by licensed outfitters and guides
Title
Permitting guided bear hunts by licensed outfitters and guides
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Kenny Mann [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 145) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-18 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 145) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Originating in Senate Natural Resources |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 22a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |