WV SB582 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to revise the article relating to arbitration and implement the terms of the Uniform Arbitration Act. The bill defines terms, including notice and the applicability of the article, proscribes the effectiveness of agreements to arbitrate and identifies nonwaivable provisions; allows for application for judicial relief from agreements to arbitrate; makes an agreement to arbitrate valid unless a legal or equitable reason for revocation exists; provides for the terms by which arbitration may continue if challenged; provides the process for motions to compel or stay arbitration; provides for provisional remedies to protect the effectiveness of arbitration proceedings; provides the process for initiation of arbitration; provides for the consolidation of separate arbitration proceedings; provides for the appointment of an arbitrator and default process if not agreed by the parties; requires neutrality of arbitrators; requires disclosure by arbitrators of matters affecting impartiality; requires a majority of arbitrators to agree to exercise powers; provides immunity for arbitrators, requires competency to testify, and provides for attorneys’ fees and costs for challenges from which arbitrators’ are immune; provides the general process for arbitration; allows parties to be represented by a lawyer in arbitrations; outlines the procedure for witnesses, subpoenas, depositions and discovery in arbitrations; provides for judicial enforcement of preaward ruling by arbitrator; provides for a record of an award and the requirements for an award; allows the change of an award by an arbitrator upon motion under certain conditions; provides that certain remedies and the fees and costs of arbitration may be a part of an arbitration award; allows for confirmation by a court of an award upon motion; provides the process and grounds for vacating an award by a court; provides the process and grounds for the modification or correction of an award upon motion; provides that a court shall enter a judgment upon confirmation of an award and may add reasonable attorneys’ fees and costs; provides for jurisdiction over arbitration agreements by a court of this state; provides venue; provides that appeals may be taken from orders related to arbitration proceedings; requires uniform construction of the act; provides that this act complies with the Electronic Signatures in Global and National Commerce Act; and provides the effective date of the act. Sections
Title
Implementing terms of Uniform Arbitration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Mitch Carmichael [R] | Sen. William Cole [R] | Sen. Donald Cookman [D] |
Sen. Mike Hall [R] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Gregory Tucker [D] |
Sen. Bob Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 102) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 390) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 16) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 390) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 16) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 16) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/29/13 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/27/13 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | Senate | To Interstate Cooperation |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | To Interstate Cooperation then Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 10 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 10 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 10 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 10 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 6B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 6B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 6B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |