WV SB577 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2010
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the intent of the Legislature that charitable raffles are limited to paper raffle tickets and that electronic or mechanical raffle ticket dispenser s , raffle ticket reader s or other electronic or mechanical device of whatever design or function shall not be used .
Title
Clarifying definition of "raffle"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-01 | To Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 392) | |
2010-03-13 | House concurred in Senate effective date (Voice) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 20) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 20) | |
2010-03-12 | House Message received | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Passed House (Roll No. 284) | |
2010-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-03-08 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-04 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 32) | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 32) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-02 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2010-02-24 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2010-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-02-24 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2010-02-15 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-15 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-15 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-02-15 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 21 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 21 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=577&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |