WV SB567 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Including treason, murder, armed robbery, and organized crimes for which communications can be intercepted
Title
Including treason, murder, armed robbery, and organized crimes for which communications can be intercepted
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 252) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 252) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4502 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |