WV HB4502 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to include the offenses of murder and armed robbery for which a prosecutor could apply for an order authorizing interception.
Title
Adding the crimes of murder and armed robbery to the list of offenses for which a prosecutor may apply for an order authorizing interception
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Riley Moore [R] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] |
Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. Jason Harshbarger [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 361) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 367) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 208) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 367) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 208) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/15/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 361) |
2018-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 367) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 208) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |