WV SB563 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting sexual assault victim be subjected to certain physical examinations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting sexual assault victim be subjected to certain physical examinations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 143) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 143) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-18HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-15SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-15SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 143)
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 143)
2019-02-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-15SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-14SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-13SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-13SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-08SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-08SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
618B11Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback