WV SB551 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to failure of employers to make contributions on behalf of employees to retirement plan administered by CPRB
Title
Relating to failure of employers to make contributions on behalf of employees to retirement plan administered by CPRB
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 495) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 473) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 249) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 473) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 249) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 495) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 473) |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 249) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Committee Amendment Reported |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Pensions Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 2/22/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Pensions |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Pensions then Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10D | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 10 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |