WV SB539 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 232, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 232, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Cold Case database, explaining the types of cases to be included in the Cold Case database, explaining the state agency developing the Cold Case database, delineating the information that must be provided for inclusion in the Cold Case database for each investigation and delineating the information that may be provided for inclusion in the Cold Case database for each investigation if applicable to either the victim of the crime or the suspect of the crime.
Title
Creating cold case database
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Mike Oliverio [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 349) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 433) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 94) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 433) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 94) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 232, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/6/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-06 | Senate | To Governor 3/6/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 349) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-01 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 433) |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-06 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 94) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |