WV SB539 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Recommitted to Government Organization on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Recommitted to Government Organization on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing cities in which certain police chiefs are entitled to reinstatement
Title
Relating to reinstatement of certain police chiefs and deputy chiefs
Sponsors
Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Recommitted to Government Organization on 3rd reading | |
2011-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-02 | Constitutional rule rejected (Roll No. 34) | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-01 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-01 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-17 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-17 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2854 (Similar To) 2011-01-26 - To House Political Subdivisions
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 14 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |