WV SB535 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to reorganize the Division of Tourism as the new West Virginia Tourism Office. It transfers certain powers and duties of the Tourism Commission to the new West Virginia Tourism Office, and sets a requirement for quarterly meetings. Additionally, the bill restructures the Tourism Advertising Partnership Program as a cooperative advertising program administered by the new West Virginia Tourism Office and vests in the Executive Director all authority for expenditures of funds in the Tourism Promotion Fund.
Title
Reorganizing Division of Tourism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 518) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 485) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 198) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 187) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 485) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 198) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 187) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 518) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 485) |
2017-04-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-28 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-03-25 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-27 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2017-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 198) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 187) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2899 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 12a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 8a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2I | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |