WV SB527 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to process of filling vacancies in certain elected offices
Title
Relating to process of filling vacancies in certain elected offices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 469) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 120) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 120) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 120) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 469) |
2013-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2013-04-13 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2013-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2013-04-13 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2013-04-13 | House | Deferred |
2013-04-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2857 (Similar To) 2013-03-07 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 4a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |