WV SB522 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 309, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 309, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allocate a percentage of county excise taxes received from transfers of title to real estate in each county for funding improvements to election administration, infrastructure, and physical and cyber security; allocate a percentage of county excise taxes received from transfers of title to real estate in each county for funding other county purposes including but not limited to compliance with the Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act; authorize the Secretary of State to promulgate legislative rules establishing minimum adequate funding thresholds and standards based on county classification for improving election administration, infrastructure, and security; and authorize county clerks to reallocate the excess portion of funding for improving election administration, infrastructure, and security to other approved county purposes upon determination by the Secretary of State that the minimum funding thresholds and standards have been met.
Title
Allocating percentage of county excise taxes for funding improvements to election administration
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 580) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 670) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 289) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 670) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 289) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 309, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/17/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 580) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 670) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-28 | House | To Finance |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 289) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2023-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 22 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |