WV SB521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 179, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 179, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring chief executive of municipal law-enforcement agency be certified law-enforcement officer
Title
Requiring chief executive of municipal law-enforcement agency be certified law-enforcement officer
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 485) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 485) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 471) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 470) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 194) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 194) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 485) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 471) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 470) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 194) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 194) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 179, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 485) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 485) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 471) |
2018-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 470) |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 194) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 194) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/22/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4526 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - To House Political Subdivisions