WV SB520 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing PEIA ability to recover benefits or claims obtained through fraud
Title
Allowing PEIA ability to recover benefits or claims obtained through fraud
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Bob Ashley [R] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] |
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 379) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 449) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 166) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 449) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 166) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 379) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 449) |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2016-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/9/16 |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 166) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4543 (Similar To) 2016-02-16 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |