WV SB520 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize municipalities to provide administrative procedures for the assessment and collection of delinquent municipal fees, with the right to appeal to circuit court.
Title
Authorizing municipalities' assessment and collection of delinquent service fees
Sponsors
Sen. Edwin Bowman [D] | Del. Frank Deem [R] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Del. Melvin Kessler [D] |
Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Joseph Minard [D] | Sen. Randy White [D] | Sen. John Yoder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-28 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-28 | To Finance | |
2008-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-27 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 51) | |
2008-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-27 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 50) | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-26 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-26 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-26 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-07 | To Finance | |
2008-02-07 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-31 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-31 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2008-01-31 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-31 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2008-01-31 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3085 (Similar To) 2011-02-09 - To House Judiciary
HB4077 (Same As) 2010-02-19 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4108
HB4077 (Same As) 2010-02-19 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4108
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=520&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |