WV SB508 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain attire for deer hunters with muzzleloaders
Title
Requiring certain attire for deer hunters with muzzleloaders
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. David Stover [R] | Sen. Patrick Martin [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 455) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 116) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 116) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 455) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2022-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-02-15 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 116) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-31 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-31 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4486 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |