WV SB506 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB506

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Deregulating persons who perform work on heating, ventilating, and cooling systems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deregulating persons who perform work on heating, ventilating, and cooling systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 460) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 409) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 211) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-21SenateTo Governor 3/21/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2018-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 460)
2018-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 409)
2018-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-05HouseWith amendment, do pass
2018-02-28HouseTo House Government Organization
2018-02-28HouseTo Government Organization
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 211)
2018-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-26SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-23Senate2nd reference dispensed
2018-02-23SenateSenate further considered bill
2018-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading to Government Organization
2018-02-23SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-23SenateImmediate consideration
2018-02-23SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
2018-02-07SenateTo Workforce
2018-02-07SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-07SenateTo Workforce then Government Organization
2018-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB506 (Carry Over) 2017-03-03 - To Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21161Repealed CodeCitation Text
211610Repealed CodeCitation Text
21162Repealed CodeCitation Text
21163Repealed CodeCitation Text
21164Repealed CodeCitation Text
21165Repealed CodeCitation Text
21166Repealed CodeCitation Text
21167Repealed CodeCitation Text
21168Repealed CodeCitation Text
21169Repealed CodeCitation Text
29312bAmended CodeCitation Text
293D1Repealed CodeCitation Text
293D2Repealed CodeCitation Text
293D3Repealed CodeCitation Text
293D4Repealed CodeCitation Text
293D5Repealed CodeCitation Text
293D6Repealed CodeCitation Text
293D7Repealed CodeCitation Text
293D8Repealed CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=506&year=2018&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB506%20INTR.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=506
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB506%20SUB1.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=506
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB506%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=506
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB506%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=506
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-27-0211.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00409.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0460.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback