WV SB498 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that the tax map rules apply to both paper and digital tax maps, and to create conformity between the language of the statute and the supporting legislative rule.
Title
Clarifying tax map rules apply to paper and electronic documents
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Mitch Carmichael [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] |
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 30) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 30) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2838 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - To House Political Subdivisions
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 1C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 1C | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |