WV SB498 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-11)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-06 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on January 30 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-06 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend Neighborhood Investment Program Act, and eligibility for tax credits under the act, until July 1, 2011.
Title
Extending Neighborhood Investment Program Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-06 | To Finance | |
2008-02-06 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-30 | To Economic Development | |
2008-01-30 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2008-01-30 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-30 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2008-01-30 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4357 (Same As) 2010-02-05 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=498&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |