WV SB490 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizing trademark counterfeiting
Title
Criminalizing trademark counterfeiting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-29 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-29 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-29 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-27 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-24 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4615 (Same As) 2012-02-20 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 2 | 14a | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 14b | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 14c | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 14d | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 14e | New Code | See Bill Text |